NJ A3211 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2738
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.267.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.267.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies law concerning the advertising and promoting of NJ farm products.
Title
Clarifies law concerning the advertising and promoting of NJ farm products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.267. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S3179 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2738 (Carry Over) 2014-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3179 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A3211 (1R)
S3179 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A3211 (1R)