NJ A3165 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4376
Note: Carry Over of previous A4888
Note: Carry Over of previous A4888
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that application to collocate wireless communications equipment be reviewed by administrative officer.
Title
Clarifies that application to collocate wireless communications equipment be reviewed by administrative officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3165 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4888 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S4082 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4888 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S4082 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading