NJ A3157 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4435
Note: Carry Over of previous S2886
Note: Carry Over of previous A4360
Note: Carry Over of previous S2886
Note: Carry Over of previous A4360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides anti-stigmatization protections to public school student whose school breakfast or school lunch bill is in arrears and requires school district to communicate about arrearages to parent and not to student.
Title
Provides anti-stigmatization protections to public school student whose school breakfast or school lunch bill is in arrears and requires school district to communicate about arrearages to parent and not to student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3157 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S571 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2886 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4360 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S571 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2886 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4360 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3157 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3157_I1.HTM |