NJ A3072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5476
Note: Carry Over of previous A3835
Note: Carry Over of previous A3835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Tiny Home Pilot Program" in three regions of State.
Title
Establishes "Tiny Home Pilot Program" in three regions of State.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3072 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S177 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3835 (Carry Over) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S177 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3835 (Carry Over) 2016-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee