NJ A3039 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.250.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.250.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness in DOH.**
Title
Establishes NJ Task Force on Lupus Education and Awareness in DOH.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2033 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2033 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.250. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2013-09-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2033 (1R) |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2033 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3039 (1R)