NJ A3005 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires debt collectors, in certain circumstances, to cease debt collections against certain victims of identity theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires debt collectors, in certain circumstances, to cease debt collections against certain victims of identity theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-15SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2013-03-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2013-02-21AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2012-12-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-06-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1867 (Same As) 2012-05-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback