NJ A2957 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1750
Note: Carry Over of previous A5379
Note: Carry Over of previous A5379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to examine issues and make recommendations concerning youth sports, including abusive coaching, confrontational parents, and bullying of players.
Title
Establishes task force to examine issues and make recommendations concerning youth sports, including abusive coaching, confrontational parents, and bullying of players.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2957 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5379 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5379 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee