NJ A2946 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes failure to return erroneous person-to-person electronic payments following proper notification.
Title
Criminalizes failure to return erroneous person-to-person electronic payments following proper notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3169 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1125 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1125 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading