NJ A2927 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on August 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-31 - Approved P.L.2010, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on August 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-31 - Approved P.L.2010, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects.
Title
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-31 | Approved P.L.2010, c.62. | |
2010-06-28 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) | |
2010-06-28 | Substituted for S2002 (1R) | |
2010-06-21 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-2) | |
2010-06-17 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2002 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - Substituted by A2927