NJ A2844 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to post on its website the current adopted budget of any county or municipality that does not maintain its own website; also requires posting of three immediately preceding adopted budgets.
Title
Requires DCA to post on its website the current adopted budget of any county or municipality that does not maintain its own website; also requires posting of three immediately preceding adopted budgets.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Approved P.L.2011, c.7. | |
2010-12-13 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for S2022 | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-30 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-1) | |
2010-09-20 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2022 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Substituted by A2844