NJ A2777 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines reasonable deviations in the course of transporting firearms.
Title
Defines reasonable deviations in the course of transporting firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-17) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-18) (Weinberg) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Oroho) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (43-29-4) |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Motion To Table (44-29-1) (Greenwald) |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Rible) |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |