NJ A2641 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Approved P.L.2014, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Approved P.L.2014, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns to support farm to school and school gardens programs.
Title
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns to support farm to school and school gardens programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.38. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Substituted for S1903 (1R) |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1903 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - Substituted by A2641 (1R)