NJ A2632 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Taxation to display Senior Gold prescription program information on tax return instructions.
Title
Requires Division of Taxation to display Senior Gold prescription program information on tax return instructions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-16 | Approved P.L.2011, c.131. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for S582 (1R) | |
2011-06-13 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee | |
2010-10-25 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-09-30 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A2632 (1R)