NJ A2617 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6095
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.228.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.228.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide hiring preference to employees who have reached maximum medical improvement following work-related injury.
Title
Requires employers to provide hiring preference to employees who have reached maximum medical improvement following work-related injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.228. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-2) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2998 (1R) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Lagana) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6095 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2998 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A2617 (1R)
S2998 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A2617 (1R)