NJ A2607 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5797
Note: Carry Over of previous S4086
Note: Carry Over of previous S4086
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies definition of "paratransit service" under various sections of law.
Title
Modifies definition of "paratransit service" under various sections of law.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Michael Inganamort [R] | Rep. Andrea Katz [D] |
Rep. Dawn Fantasia [R] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5797 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4086 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S360 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4086 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S360 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee