NJ A2544 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3668
Note: Carry Over of previous A2830
Note: Carry Over of previous S1650
Note: Carry Over of previous A2830
Note: Carry Over of previous S1650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for buprenorphine and buprenorphine/naloxone for pain treatment without step therapy or fail-first protocols.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for buprenorphine and buprenorphine/naloxone for pain treatment without step therapy or fail-first protocols.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2544 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A2830 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1650 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2143 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2830 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1650 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2143 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2544 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2544_I1.HTM |