NJ A2513 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Substituted by S831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Substituted by S831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits wager to be placed at racetracks or casino simulcasting facilities in advance for races not simulcast at facility under certain circumstances if race is simulcast at other facilities in the State.
Title
Permits wager to be placed at racetracks or casino simulcasting facilities in advance for races not simulcast at facility under certain circumstances if race is simulcast at other facilities in the State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Substituted by S831 | |
2011-01-20 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S831 (Same As) 2011-04-08 - Approved P.L.2011, c.48.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2513 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2513_I1.HTM |