NJ A2504 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1969
Note: Carry Over of previous A5150
Note: Carry Over of previous A5150
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lactation rooms be made available at certain PANYNJ airports.
Title
Requires lactation rooms be made available at certain PANYNJ airports.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2504 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5150 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
A5150 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)