NJ A2462 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1460

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes notification standards for certain service contracts with automatic renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes notification standards for certain service contracts with automatic renewal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-1-0)
2020-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-03AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1460 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (73-2-1)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback