NJ A2450 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3748
Note: Carry Over of previous A5289
Note: Carry Over of previous A5289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1936
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1936
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT Commissioner to advertise availability of certain transportation programs and services.
Title
Requires DOT Commissioner to advertise availability of certain transportation programs and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1936 |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3748 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1936 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.155.
A5289 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1936 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.155.
A5289 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee