NJ A2419 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for certain psychologists to prescribe medications.
Title
Provides for certain psychologists to prescribe medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-27-8) |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S137 (Same As) 2012-01-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee