NJ A2317 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A661
Note: Carry Over of previous A4885
Note: Carry Over of previous A4885
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires kennels and veterinary facilities to provide for supervision of dogs, training of employees, and maintenance of certain records; designated as "Daisy's Law."
Title
Requires kennels and veterinary facilities to provide for supervision of dogs, training of employees, and maintenance of certain records; designated as "Daisy's Law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2317 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4885 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3295 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4885 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3295 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee