NJ A2297 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4695

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Approved P.L.2017, c.241.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurance coverage for contraceptives to include prescriptions for 6 months.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurance coverage for contraceptives to include prescriptions for 6 months.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S659 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.241.
2017-12-07SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-2)
2017-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2017-07-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (60-2-6)
2017-07-31Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2017-07-31AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2017-07-31AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2017-06-22SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-8)
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted for S659
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-11-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-10-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-22-4)
2016-06-02AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-18AssemblyReviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S659 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A2297
A4695 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback