NJ A2270 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1323
Note: Carry Foward to future A4663
Note: Carry Over of previous A3607
Note: Carry Foward to future A4663
Note: Carry Over of previous A3607
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer voluntary recovery residence certification program.
Title
Requires DCA to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer voluntary recovery residence certification program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2270 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2270 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S962 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2270 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S962 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading