NJ A2268 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2899
Note: Carry Over of previous A4568
Note: Carry Over of previous A4568
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities and boards of education to jointly contract for certain group insurance benefits for their employees.
Title
Allows municipalities and boards of education to jointly contract for certain group insurance benefits for their employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S750 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2899 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4568 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2899 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4568 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2268 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2268_I1.HTM |