NJ S750 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1455
Note: Carry Over of previous S2899
Note: Carry Over of previous A4568
Note: Carry Over of previous S2899
Note: Carry Over of previous A4568
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities and boards of education to jointly contract for certain group insurance benefits for their employees.
Title
Allows municipalities and boards of education to jointly contract for certain group insurance benefits for their employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S750 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2899 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2268 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4568 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2899 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2268 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4568 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S750 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/750_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S750 |