NJ A2266 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3303
Note: Carry Over of previous A4804
Note: Carry Over of previous A4804
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid cover professional violence prevention counseling services.
Title
Requires Medicaid cover professional violence prevention counseling services.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S359 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3303 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4804 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3303 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4804 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2266 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2266_I1.HTM |