NJ A2241 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2962
Note: Carry Foward to future S372
Note: Carry Over of previous A1356
Note: Carry Over of previous S1396
Note: Carry Foward to future S372
Note: Carry Over of previous A1356
Note: Carry Over of previous S1396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain applicants to submit personal statement of veteran status, in lieu of determination of veteran status, prior to issuance of civil service eligible list; requires submission of determination of status prior to employment.
Title
Permits certain applicants to submit personal statement of veteran status, in lieu of determination of veteran status, prior to issuance of civil service eligible list; requires submission of determination of status prior to employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2241 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2241 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S227 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1356 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1396 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2241 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S227 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1356 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1396 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2241 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2500/2241_I1.HTM |