NJ A2219 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5663
Note: Carry Over of previous S3985
Note: Carry Over of previous S3985
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of "qualified offshore wind project" to include "open access offshore wind transmission facility."
Title
Expands definition of "qualified offshore wind project" to include "open access offshore wind transmission facility."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5663 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3985 (1R)
S3985 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.440.
S3985 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.440.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2219 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2219_I1.HTM |