NJ A2217 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Approved P.L.2010, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Approved P.L.2010, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends expiration date of special appraisal process for Green Acres and farmland preservation programs from 2009 to 2014 for lands in Highlands Region.
Title
Extends expiration date of special appraisal process for Green Acres and farmland preservation programs from 2009 to 2014 for lands in Highlands Region.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chiusano [R] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] |
Rep. Alison McHose [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Approved P.L.2010, c.70. | |
2010-06-28 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | |
2010-06-28 | Substituted for S1004 (1R) | |
2010-06-21 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-05-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1004 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - Substituted by A2217 (1R)