NJ A2212 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2165
Note: Carry Foward to future S2143
Note: Carry Over of previous A1384
Note: Carry Foward to future S2143
Note: Carry Over of previous A1384
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants credit against business income taxes to developer of rental housing reserved for occupancy by veterans.*
Title
Grants credit against business income taxes to developer of rental housing reserved for occupancy by veterans.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2212 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2212 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1384 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S739 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2212 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1384 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S739 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee