NJ A2185 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2333
Note: Carry Foward to future A5229
Note: Carry Over of previous A2595
Note: Carry Over of previous S1086
Note: Carry Foward to future A5229
Note: Carry Over of previous A2595
Note: Carry Over of previous S1086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to continuously maintain open enrollment period for federal Housing Choice Voucher Program pre-applications.
Title
Requires DCA to continuously maintain open enrollment period for federal Housing Choice Voucher Program pre-applications.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2185 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2185 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2595 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1637 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1086 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2185 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2595 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1637 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1086 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee