NJ A2176 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4456
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.209.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes possession and sale of alpha-pyrrolidinopentiophenone (alpha-PVP) commonly known as "flakka," or "flocka."
Title
Criminalizes possession and sale of alpha-pyrrolidinopentiophenone (alpha-PVP) commonly known as "flakka," or "flocka."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S156 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.209. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S156 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-3-0) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4456 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S156 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A2176
S156 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A2176