NJ A2153 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1950
Note: Carry Foward to future S1950
Note: Carry Over of previous A1904
Note: Carry Over of previous S2250
Note: Carry Foward to future S1950
Note: Carry Over of previous A1904
Note: Carry Over of previous S2250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that definition of mental illness in law governing involuntary commitment to treatment includes substance use disorder if dangerous standard met.
Title
Clarifies that definition of mental illness in law governing involuntary commitment to treatment includes substance use disorder if dangerous standard met.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2153 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2153 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1904 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1886 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2250 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2153 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1904 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1886 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2250 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2153 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2153_I1.HTM |