NJ A2108 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5982

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes standards for installation of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizes municipal deviation standards; exempts installation at gasoline service station fromcertain requirements.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes standards for installation of electric vehicle charging stations; authorizes municipal deviation standards; exempts installation at gasoline service station fromcertain requirements.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-10AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5982 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S938 (Same As) 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback