NJ S3223 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that electric vehicle charging infrastructure is inherently beneficial, may require minor site plan approval, and is permitted accessory use and structure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that electric vehicle charging infrastructure is inherently beneficial, may require minor site plan approval, and is permitted accessory use and structure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-11SenatePassed by the Senate (32-0)
2020-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback