NJ A2095 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1905
Note: Carry Over of previous A4302
Note: Carry Over of previous A4302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires posting of signs warning of presence of, and potential danger caused by, duckweed on water bodies in public parks.
Title
Requires posting of signs warning of presence of, and potential danger caused by, duckweed on water bodies in public parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-10-4) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2095 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4302 (Carry Over) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4302 (Carry Over) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee