NJ A2095 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for emergency medical services delivery.
Title
Revises requirements for emergency medical services delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-15) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S818 (SCS) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (44-31-3) | |
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S818 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A2095 (2R)