NJ A2049 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1639
Note: Carry Foward to future S1159
Note: Carry Over of previous A1630
Note: Carry Foward to future S1159
Note: Carry Over of previous A1630
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3062 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3062 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for businesses that employ apprentices in DOL registered apprenticeships.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for businesses that employ apprentices in DOL registered apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Howarth [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3062 (3R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3062 (3R)
A2049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3062 (3R)
A1630 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3062 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2049 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3062 (3R)
A1630 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3062 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session