NJ A2037 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Substituted by S71 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - Substituted by S71 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Yellow Dot" program in MVC.*
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Yellow Dot" program in MVC.*
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Substituted by S71 (SCS) |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-27 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S71 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.191.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A2037 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A2500/2037_I1.HTM |