NJ A2021 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5593
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Approved P.L.2022, c.106.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Approved P.L.2022, c.106.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires embryo storage facilities to record and report health information of patients in manner that is consistent with certain federal laws.
Title
Requires embryo storage facilities to record and report health information of patients in manner that is consistent with certain federal laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1138 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.106. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1138 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-4-0) |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5593 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1138 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2021
S1138 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2021