NJ A2004 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4824
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.230.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.230.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipality to pay certain nonresidential property tax appeal refunds in equal installments over period of three years. *
Title
Requires municipality to pay certain nonresidential property tax appeal refunds in equal installments over period of three years. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2673 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2673 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.230. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-23-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-11) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2673 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-22-0) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Johnson) (48-24-0) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Rooney) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Karabinchak) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4824 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2673 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A2004 (3R)
S2673 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A2004 (3R)