NJ A1973 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1243

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Appraisal Management Company Registration and Regulation Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Appraisal Management Company Registration and Regulation Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2401 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.72.
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
2017-02-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-02-13SenateSubstituted for S2401 (SCS/1R)
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2016-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2016-06-20AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-06-20AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1243 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S2401 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A1973 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback