NJ A1959 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1808
Note: Carry Foward to future S3487
Note: Carry Over of previous A2839
Note: Carry Foward to future S3487
Note: Carry Over of previous A2839
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reporting of certain attempted and completed suicides by minors.
Title
Requires reporting of certain attempted and completed suicides by minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] |
Rep. DeAnne DeFuccio [R] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2839 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2727 (Same As) 2023-01-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1959 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2839 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2727 (Same As) 2023-01-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading