NJ A1921 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns AG guidelines on bias incident investigation standards.
Title
Concerns AG guidelines on bias incident investigation standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Al Abdelaziz [D] | Rep. Luanne Peterpaul [D] |
Rep. Gabriel Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Margie Donlon [D] | Rep. Rosy Bagolie [D] | Rep. Garnet Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2025-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2025-01-27 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-09-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
2024-09-19 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4440 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee