NJ A1896 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5632
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact.
Title
Adopts Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5632 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2023-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S702 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2023-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S702 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee