NJ A1849 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits State Board of Education from limiting number of certain two-year college credits that may be applied towards meeting teacher certification requirements.
Title
Prohibits State Board of Education from limiting number of certain two-year college credits that may be applied towards meeting teacher certification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1766 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S1766 |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Education Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1849 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1766 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A1849
S1766 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A1849