NJ A1828 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S328
Note: Carry Foward to future A789
Note: Carry Over of previous A3824
Note: Carry Over of previous S67
Note: Carry Foward to future A789
Note: Carry Over of previous A3824
Note: Carry Over of previous S67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes system for portable benefits for workers who provide services to consumers through contracting agents.
Title
Establishes system for portable benefits for workers who provide services to consumers through contracting agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1828 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1828 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3824 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S943 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S67 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1828 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3824 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S943 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S67 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1828 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1828_I1.HTM |