NJ A181 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4449
Note: Carry Over of previous S1668
Note: Carry Over of previous S1668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum dollar amount required in Maintenance and Preservation Funds of cemetery companies established before December 1, 1971.
Title
Establishes minimum dollar amount required in Maintenance and Preservation Funds of cemetery companies established before December 1, 1971.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4449 (Carry Over) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1668 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1869 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1668 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1869 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A181 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A0500/181_I1.HTM |