NJ A1775 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A232
Note: Carry Foward to future S927
Note: Carry Over of previous A2321
Note: Carry Over of previous S1798
Note: Carry Foward to future S927
Note: Carry Over of previous A2321
Note: Carry Over of previous S1798
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires settlement agreements concerning equal employment opportunity to be approved by NJT board of directors.
Title
Requires settlement agreements concerning equal employment opportunity to be approved by NJT board of directors.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1775 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1775 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2321 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1985 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1798 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1775 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2321 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1985 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1798 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1775 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1775_I1.HTM |